CA SB766 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - July 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2790 and 9500 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: weatherization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB766 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03AssemblyJuly 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 890.) (April 30).
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2790Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code9500Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback