CA SB766 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 114.7 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: indirect cost recovery: wildlife crossing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB766 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 890.) (April 30). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 114.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |