CA SB766 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 1297.185) to Chapter 5 of Title 9.3 of Part 3 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to international commercial disputes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International commercial arbitration: representation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 766 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB766 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-01-13SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4021.) (January 9).
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1297.185New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code9251Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback