CA SB765 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65913.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: streamlined approval process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Housing and Community Development] and [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB765 Wiener (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB765 Wiener Reconsider (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB765 Wiener (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-07-12AssemblyJuly 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1341.)
2017-05-31SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Wiener.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 1340.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 849.) (April 26).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17457.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17463.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code17516Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17536Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33112Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65913.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback