CA SB762 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1657.1 to the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 1281.97 and 1281.98 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to contracts.
Title
Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB762 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 762 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB762 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 762 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB762 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2213.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 885.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 6). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.97 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1657.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |