CA SB762 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3041 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry: administration of immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB762 Hernandez et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 762 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB762 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-10 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-22SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5619.)
2018-08-21SenateSet for hearing August 22.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code3041Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code704Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback