CA SB760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: State Route 241: reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | May 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |