CA SB76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14002, 41206.01, and 41206.03 of, and to add Section 41207.47 to, the Education Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: constitutional minimum funding obligation: inflation and cost-of-living adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 76 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB76 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB76 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1595.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2299.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code14002Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41206.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41206.03Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41207.47New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback