CA SB759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3019 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: vote by mail ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB759 McGuire (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-06-13AssemblyJune 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4056.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4005.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-09-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-04-18SenateApril 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback