CA SB757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 21168.6.12 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: Twenty-Eight by ’28 Initiative pillar projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB757 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3168.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-01-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3142.) (January 23).
2020-01-21SenateSet for hearing January 23.
2020-01-21SenateJanuary 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14).
2020-01-08SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2020-01-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21168.6.12New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback