CA SB755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10095.5 of the Insurance Code, relating to residential property insurance.
Title
Insurance: residential property insurance: requirements upon nonrenewal.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB755 Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3129.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3100.) (January 15). |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10095.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |