CA SB750 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4853 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: license plate pilot programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB750 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2017-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1138.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1081.) (May 15).
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25).
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code293New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code294New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code4853Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code4854New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code5200Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code5204Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code1022Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback