CA SB750 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 313.1 and 313.2 of the Education Code, relating to English language education.
Title
English language education: English learners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB750 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 750 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB750 Mendoza (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 750 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB750 Mendoza (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2855.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1019.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 8). |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 313.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 313.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |