CA SB75 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11370.4 and 11372 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: fentanyl.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-01-11 | Senate | January 11 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 2747.) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |