CA SB75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8227.7, 8239, 8263, 8265.5, 8278.3, 17375, 33050, 35147, 37700, 41202, 41202.5, 41203.1, 46392, 47604.33, 47605, 47605.6, 47606.5, 47632, 47635, 48985, 51222, 52064.5, 52065, 52073, 52452, 53070, 53071, 53072, 53073, 53075, 56122, 56836.08, 56836.165, 56836.24, 64001, 65001, 88827, 88828, 88830, 88831, and 88833 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 56475) of Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add Sections 8207, 8236.3, 8266.2, 14002.05, 41207.46, 41404.5, 44226, 56477, and 56836.045 to, to add Article 13.1 (commencing with Section 8280) and Article 19.5 (commencing with Section 8430) to Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 44690) to Chapter 3.1 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Article 14 (commencing with Section 45500) to Chapter 5 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 56836.39) to Chapter 7.2 of Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add Article 5.1 (commencing with Section 69617) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 10850) to Part 7 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to repeal and add Section 56213 of, and to repeal and add Article 14 (commencing with Section 8286) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.6 of, and to add Section 6253.21 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 1596.86 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 5886) to Part 4 of Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 75 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB75 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB75 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-06-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1723.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 2396.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 2390.)
2019-06-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-24AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code14002.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code17375Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33050Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code35147Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code37700Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41202Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41202.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41203.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41207.46New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41404.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44226New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code46392Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47604.33Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47606.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47632Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47635Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48985Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51222Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52064.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52065Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52073Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52452Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53070Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53071Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53072Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53073Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53075Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56122Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56477New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code56836.045New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code56836.08Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.165Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code64001Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code65001Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8207New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8227.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8236.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8239Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8263Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8265.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8266.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8278.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88827Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88828Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88830Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88831Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88833Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17581.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6253.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1596.86Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5886New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback