CA SB75 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 667.5 and 2933.5 of the Penal Code, relating to violent felonies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violent felonies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - [Final] hearing set for [04-18-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2017-04-19SenateApril 18 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 747.) Reconsideration granted.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-06SenateApril 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-04SenateApril 4 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-22SenateMarch 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-15SenateMarch 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2933.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback