CA SB75 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1220 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 100504 and 100505 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1266, 1279.2, 1367.54, 1373.622, 1420, 1423, 104150, 104322, 110050, 120960, 120962, 124040, and 124977 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 121348) of Part 4 of Division 105 of, and to add Sections 120780.2, 121348.4, 122425, 122430, and 122435 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 10123.184 and 10127.16 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 19548.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 4369, 4369.1, 4369.2, 4369.3, 4369.4, 4369.5, 14007.2, 14007.5, 14015.5, 14105.94, 14105.192, 14154, 14186, 14186.1, 14186.3, 15894, and 24005 of, to amend and repeal Section 14134 of, and to add Sections 14007.8 and 14127.7 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Sections 70 and 71 of Chapter 23 of, and to amend Section 5 of Chapter 361 of, the Statutes of 2013, and to amend Section 1 of Chapter 551 of the Statutes of 2014, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-06-19 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB75 Committee on Budget an d Fiscal ReviewBy Leno (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 75 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 75 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER Amend By CHANG Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By HOLDEN (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB75 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2015.
2015-06-24 Approved by the Governor.
2015-06-23SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
2015-06-19SenateUnanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1509.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-06-19SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-06-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Amendments by Assembly Member Chang tabled on motion by Assembly Member Holden. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 2056.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2057.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-03-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-03-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-03-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 378.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-03-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-03-18SenateFrom committee: Ordered to second reading.
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time.
2015-01-09SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1220Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100504Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100505Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104150Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104322Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code110050Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120780.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120960Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120962Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121348.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122425New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122430New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122435New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code124040Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code124977Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1266Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1279.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1367.54Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1373.622Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1420Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1423Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10123.184Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10127.16Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19548.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14015.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.192Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.94Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14127.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14134Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14154Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14186Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14186.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14186.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15894Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code24005Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4369.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_75&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150109_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150323_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150324_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150616_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150619_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20150624_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20150323_0309PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20150619_1006AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20150619_1008AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20150619_1128AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback