CA SB75 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 116.232 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 12419.10, 68086, 68502.5, 68511.7, 70628, and 77203 of, and to add Section 68502.6 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1203.2, 1229, 1230, 1231, 1232, 1233, 1233.1, 1233.15, 1233.2, 1233.3, 1233.4, 1233.6, 1233.61, and 3000.08 of, and to repeal Section 1233.8 of, the Penal Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 19210 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 903.45 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 75 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB75 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB75 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2013.
2013-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2013-06-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2013-06-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 1983.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 1985.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 892.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure116.232Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12419.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68086Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68502.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68502.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code68511.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code70628Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code77203Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code19210New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1229Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1230Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1231Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1232Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.61Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1233.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3000.08Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code903.45Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_75&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20130612_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20130614_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20130627_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20130513_0147PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20130614_0259PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20130614_1120AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback