CA SB75 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 130156, 130157, and 130158 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health and human services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Children and Families Act of 1998: use of

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB75 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-14 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2011-03-07 Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2011-02-14 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-02-14 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 166.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-02-10 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-01-11 From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2011-01-10 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code130156New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code130157New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code130158New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback