CA SB75 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 68085.3, 68085.4, and 69957 of, and to add Section 20969.1 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 1465.8 of the Penal Code, relating to the judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judiciary.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB75 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 75 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB75 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by Governor.
2009-09-28 Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
2009-09-10 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2367.) To enrollment.
2009-09-09 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2009-09-08 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 3073.) To Senate.
2009-09-04 Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) To third reading.
2009-09-03 From inactive file to third reading file.
2009-09-02 Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
2009-08-17 Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
2009-06-15 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-11 Placed on second reading file.
2009-04-16 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-04-16 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 513.) To Assembly.
2009-04-02 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-04-01 Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
2009-01-29 To Com. on RLS.
2009-01-22 Read first time.
2009-01-21 From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
2009-01-20 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_75&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20090120_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20090904_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20090911_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20090416_1047AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20090908_0258PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_75_vote_20090910_1030AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback