CA SB749 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5845.7 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health program oversight: county reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB749 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB749 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Arambula. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Arambula. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1391.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1203.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 533.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5845.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |