CA SB749 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6254.34 to the Government Code, relating to public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Public Records Act: trade secrets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-06 - Assembly - SB 749 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez Amendment Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB749 Durazo (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-09-12AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 3512.)
2019-09-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-09-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 16. Page 3077.)
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2019-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 18).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 1383.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 800.) (April 23).
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6254.34New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback