CA SB748 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4469 of the Government Code, relating to disability access and information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability access and information: local government: notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-27 - Assembly - SB 748 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB748 Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2023.
2023-07-13 Approved by the Governor.
2023-07-05 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-06-28SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-06-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2427.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-06-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2023-06-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-05-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-04SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2023-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2023-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2023-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code4469Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback