CA SB748 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 8770) to Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to the arts.
Title
California Youth Poet Laureate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 748 Stern Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB748 Stern et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB748 Stern et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2549.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 22). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8770 | New Code | See Bill Text |