CA SB747 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 108670) to Chapter 5 of Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health impact assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-23SenateHeld in committee and under submission.
2014-01-22SenateSet for hearing January 23.
2014-01-21SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-01-18SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2014-01-17SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-01-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2014-01-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2599.) (January 15).
2014-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 15.
2014-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-25SenateHearing postponed by committee.
2013-04-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2013-04-18SenateSet, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2013-04-11SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code108670New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_747&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20130415_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20130423_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20140106_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20140116_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20140115_000007_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20140121_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback