CA SB747 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression
Action: 2009-08-27 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 8157 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career technical education: pilot preapprentice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB747 Romero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-27 Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2009-08-19 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-07-09 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-08 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
2009-07-02 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
2009-06-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2009-06-18 To Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
2009-06-03 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-06-03 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly.
2009-06-01 To Special Consent Calendar.
2009-05-28 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
2009-05-22 Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-05-18 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-05-08 Set for hearing May 18.
2009-05-05 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-05-05 Set for hearing May 11.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 728.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-23 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2009-04-17 Set for hearing April 29.
2009-04-16 Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2009-04-13 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-03-19 To Com. on RLS.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-02-28 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_747&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090413_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090423_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090528_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090625_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_bill_20090709_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090429_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090518_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090528_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090603_0356PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090701_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_747_vote_20090707_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback