CA SB746 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 16150, 29180, 29182, 29183, 29830, 33850, 33855, 33860, 33865, 33870, 33875, 33880, 33885, and 33895 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms and ammunition: prohibited possession: transfer to licensed dealer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB746 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2018-05-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-29SenateMarch 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback