CA SB744 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.75 (commencing with Section 120265) to Part 1 of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable diseases: respiratory disease information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB744 Glazer et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1393.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1203.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 937.) (April 27).
2021-04-23SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 877.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120265New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback