CA SB744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 346, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 346, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65651, 65655, and 65656 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 21163) of Division 13 of the Public Resources Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: California Environmental Quality Act: permanent supportive housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB744 Caballero Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 744 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Salas (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB744 Caballero (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 744 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Salas (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB744 Caballero (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 346, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 3187.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1157.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 845.) (April 24). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and EQ. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65656 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21163 | New Code | See Bill Text |