CA SB740 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 293, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25536.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous materials management: stationary sources: skilled and trained workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 740 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB740 Cortese et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 293, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2863.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2023-08-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-07AssemblyJune 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2023-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 18).
2023-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2023-05-04SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 937.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2023-04-19SenateApril 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2023-03-23SenateMarch 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25536.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback