CA SB740 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 281 of the Public Utilities Codes, relating to communications, declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications: California Advanced Services Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateApril 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2021-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code281Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback