CA SB740 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Set for hearing April 24.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 10509.940) to Chapter 5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance: unclaimed life insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10199.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10509.940New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback