CA SB74 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 19 @ 9:00 am in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12098.8 to the Government Code, and to add Sections 17131.14 and 24311 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to COVID-19, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep California Working Act.

Sponsors

Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Sen. Josh Becker [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Sen. Dave Cortese [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]
Sen. Brian Jones [R]Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Dave Min [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Sen. Henry Stern [D]
Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-03-11SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-02-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
2020-12-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12098.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17131.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24311New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback