CA SB739 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 20175 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Construction manager at-risk construction contracts: City of Elk Grove: zoo project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB739 Alvarado-Gil (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 935.) (April 26). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20175 | New Code | See Bill Text |