CA SB732 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 54765) of Chapter 9 of Part 29 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, and to add Section 281.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Communications: broadband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and ED. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 54765 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 281.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB732 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB732#99INT |