CA SB731 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52.1 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 1029 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 832.7, 13503, 13506, 13510, 13510.1, and 13512 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 13510) of Chapter 1 of Title 4 of Part 4 of, and to add Sections 13509.5, 13509.6, 13510.15, 13510.8, 13510.85, and 13510.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to public employment, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Peace Officers: certification: civil rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 5178.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(b) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5159.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | August 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1193.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 52.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13509.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13509.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13510.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13510.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 832.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |