CA SB731 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 805, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 805, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1502.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 16001.9 of, and to add Section 16006 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster children: housing: gender identity.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB731 Leno Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 731 Leno Senate Third Reading By CHU (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Leno (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 731 Leno Senate Third Reading By CHU (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Leno (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 805, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2446.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2781.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1502.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16001.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |