CA SB726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11004 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: benefits overpayment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-06-12AssemblyJune 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10).
2018-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-20SenateApril 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code13301New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17002Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11004Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback