CA SB726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 11004 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: benefits overpayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB726 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 726 Wiener Senate Third Reading By CARRILLO (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 726 Wiener Senate Third Reading By CARRILLO (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 6136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6069.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 6765.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | June 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 13301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |