CA SB726 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25401.1 to the Corporations Code, relating to corporate securities.
Title
Corporate securities: unlawful conduct: regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 25400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25401.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 25401.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25412.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |