CA SB722 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 631, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1596.802 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to daycare facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daycare facilities: incidental medical services plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB722 Ochoa Bogh Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 722 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB722 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 631, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2834.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-07SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3066.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-07-12AssemblyJuly 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2023-06-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2023-06-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-08SenateMay 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt.
2023-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1596.802New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback