CA SB721 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 2.2 (commencing with Section 17973) to Chapter 5 of Part 1.5 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building standards: decks and balconies: inspection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB721 Hill et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and H. & C.D.
2018-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-01-13SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4021.) (January 9).
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2017-05-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-18SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 858.) (April 25).
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 585.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateMarch 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and T. & H.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7071.20New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code4776New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code17973New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback