CA SB72 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1352 of, to add Section 2850.5 to, and to repeal Section 712.5 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 927.9, 11549.3, and 51018 of, and to add Section 1304 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 44299.91 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12211 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4785, 5018.1, 5080.18, 5096.650, 14538, 14539, 14549.5, 14553, 14572, 14591, 25751, 26052, 26055, 26060, 26062, 26063, 35600, 35605, 35625, 42977, 48704, 71300, 71301, 71302, 71303, 71304, and 71305 of, to add Sections 25711.5 and 25711.7 to, and to repeal Sections 4124 and 4515 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 309.5, 2851, and 5900 of, and to add Sections 318, 740.5, 854.5, and 2120 to, the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 104.22 to the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 85200 of, and to add Section 10001.7 to, the Water Code, and to repeal Section 34 of Chapter 718 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2013: public resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-15 - Assembly - SB 72 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB72 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2013-06-24SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2013-06-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-06-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2032.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2035.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 891.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1352Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2850.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code712.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code11549.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1304New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code51018Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code927.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44299.91Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code12211Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14538Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14539Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14549.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14553Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14572Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14591Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25711.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25711.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25751Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26052Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26055Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26060Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26062Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code26063Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code35600Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code35605Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code35625Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4124Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42977Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4515Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4785Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code48704Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5018.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5080.18Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5096.650Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71300Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71301Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71302Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71303Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71304Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71305Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2120New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2851Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code309.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code318New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5900Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code740.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code854.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code104.22New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code10001.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code85200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback