CA SB719 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5011.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: exemption from reservation fees to use state park facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5011.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback