CA SB719 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5011.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
Veterans: exemption from reservation fees to use state park facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5011.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |