CA SB718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 736, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1357.503 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10753.05 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: small employer groups.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB718 Bates Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 718 Bates Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB718 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 736, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2589.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2895.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-29AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1201.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 956.) (April 28).
2021-04-22SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-21SenateApril 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2021-04-12SenateApril 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1357.503Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10753.05Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB718

Bill Comments

feedback