CA SB717 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 883, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5623.6 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB717 Stern Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 717 Stern Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB717 Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 883, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2817.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3466.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-16AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2023-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 831.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5623.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback