CA SB716 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4001 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State Board of Pharmacy: pharmacy technician member.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB716 Hernandez et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-13SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-27SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback