CA SB716 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4001 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
California State Board of Pharmacy: pharmacy technician member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB716 Hernandez et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB716 Hernandez et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1366.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |