CA SB714 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 299, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 299, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7209 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Democratic Party: county central committees: appointment and election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB714 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 714 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB714 Caballero (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 714 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB714 Caballero (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 299, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2358.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 11. Page 2596.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 1128.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 915.) (April 26). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 7209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |